NJ S2499 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021.
Title
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4299 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.49. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4299 |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4299 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2499
A4705 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4705 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee