NJ S250 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3169

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3190 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-10-0)
2018-06-30AssemblySubstituted for A3190 (1R)
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3169 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3190 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S250 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback