NJ S2503 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases strangulation assault to crime of second degree.
Title
Increases strangulation assault to crime of second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4588 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4588 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.172. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4588 |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4588 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2503