NJ S2520 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4281
Note: Carry Over of previous A6094
Note: Carry Over of previous A6094
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4405 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4405 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to sell and convey to Educational Services Commission of New Jersey certain land and improvements known as Piscataway Regional Day School.
Title
Requires State to sell and convey to Educational Services Commission of New Jersey certain land and improvements known as Piscataway Regional Day School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4405 (1R) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4281 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4405 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Approved P.L.2020, c.103.
A6094 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4281
A4405 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Approved P.L.2020, c.103.
A6094 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4281