NJ S2522 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A675
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.409.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.409.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits cross gender strip searches in State correctional facilities.
Title
Limits cross gender strip searches in State correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4090 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.409. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-7) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4090 (1R) |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Cryan) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2522 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.409.
A4090 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2522 (1R)
A4090 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2522 (1R)