NJ S2526 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Substituted by A4126 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Substituted by A4126 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits local units and authorities to waive interest and lien enforcement for certain delinquent water and sewer utility payments during emergency circumstances.
Title
Permits local units and authorities to waive interest and lien enforcement for certain delinquent water and sewer utility payments during emergency circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Senate | Substituted by A4126 (1R) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4126 (Same As) 2020-06-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.39.