NJ S2527 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns online marketing of affordable housing units.
Title
Concerns online marketing of affordable housing units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2636 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.51. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-2-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A2636 (2R) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Sweeney) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2636 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2527 (1R)