NJ S2536 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3147

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Excludes from gross income under the gross income tax certain United States military compensation paid to members of units of the NJ National Guard and reserve components of the United States Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excludes from gross income under the gross income tax certain United States military compensation paid to members of units of the NJ National Guard and reserve components of the United States Armed Forces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3243 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3147 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback