NJ S2538 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes New Jersey National Guard members with NGB-22 form eligible for certain veterans' benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes New Jersey National Guard members with NGB-22 form eligible for certain veterans' benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-07-26SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3455 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback