NJ S2542 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1413
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipality to suspend certain zoning requirements during COVID-19 emergency.
Title
Allows municipality to suspend certain zoning requirements during COVID-19 emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2542 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4418 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4418 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee