NJ S2545 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Approved P.L.2021, c.33.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Approved P.L.2021, c.33.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain requirements concerning rights of lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, undesignated/non-binary, questioning, queer, intersex, and HIV-postive residents of long-term care facilities.
Title
Establishes certain requirements concerning rights of lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, undesignated/non-binary, questioning, queer, intersex, and HIV-postive residents of long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4288 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.33. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-1-5) |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4288 |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4288 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by S2545