NJ S2546 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A3906 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A3906 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the "New Jersey Nonprofit Security Grant Pilot Program." *
Title
Revises the "New Jersey Nonprofit Security Grant Pilot Program." *
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A3906 (2R) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Cryan) |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3906 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.169.