NJ S255 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3285

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A809 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes alternate members for farmers on State Agriculture Development Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes alternate members for farmers on State Agriculture Development Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted by A809 (ACS/1R)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3285 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4787 (1R)
A809 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback