NJ S2561 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4238 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4238 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum Medicaid reimbursement rate for adult medical day care services.
Title
Establishes minimum Medicaid reimbursement rate for adult medical day care services.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A4238 (2R) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4238 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.452.