NJ S2575 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.179.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.179.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to examine and make recommendations regarding implementation of "Anti-Bullying Bill of Rights Act."
Title
Establishes task force to examine and make recommendations regarding implementation of "Anti-Bullying Bill of Rights Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4848 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4848 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.179. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A4848 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4848 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)