NJ S2593 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Senate Amendment (18-0) (Cunningham)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits retroactive modification of judgements of conviction, including recinding mandatory minimum periods of parole ineligibility and reducing fixed minimum terms of imprisionment for certain offenses; requires study of DOC's anticipated expenses to upgrade data infrastructure.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits retroactive modification of judgements of conviction, including recinding mandatory minimum periods of parole ineligibility and reducing fixed minimum terms of imprisionment for certain offenses; requires study of DOC's anticipated expenses to upgrade data infrastructure.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenateSenate Amendment (18-0) (Cunningham)
2020-08-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-09SenateTransferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-06-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4370 (Same As) 2020-08-25 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback