NJ S2598 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4276 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4276 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "The Ballot Cure Act" to modify and establish various voting procedures.
Title
Establishes "The Ballot Cure Act" to modify and establish various voting procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4276 (2R) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4276 (Same As) 2020-08-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.70.