NJ S2600 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S555
Note: Carry Foward to future A1758
Note: Carry Foward to future A1758
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases transparency and accountability for NJT and independence of NJT board members; establishes Office of Customer Advocate; requires greater detail for capital program.
Title
Increases transparency and accountability for NJT and independence of NJT board members; establishes Office of Customer Advocate; requires greater detail for capital program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-5) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate Substitution (30-0) (Weinberg) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2600 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2600 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5333 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2600 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5333 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee