NJ S2606 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3558 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3558 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pediatric respite care program licensure requirements.
Title
Establishes pediatric respite care program licensure requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] |
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3558 (2R) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3558 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.267.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2606 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2606_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2606_R1.HTM |