NJ S2607 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1746
Note: Carry Foward to future A3664
Note: Carry Foward to future A3664
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes grants to purchase and rehabilitate abandoned homes for homeless veterans.
Title
Authorizes grants to purchase and rehabilitate abandoned homes for homeless veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2607 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2607 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4089 (Same As) 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2607 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4089 (Same As) 2019-11-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee