NJ S2607 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3670
Note: Carry Over of previous A5738
Note: Carry Over of previous A5738
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires land use plan element of municipal master plan to include climate change-related hazard vulnerability assessment.
Title
Requires land use plan element of municipal master plan to include climate change-related hazard vulnerability assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.6. |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-28-0) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A2785 (1R) |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-11) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2785 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S2607 (1R)
S3670 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5738 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S3670 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5738 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee