NJ S2610 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Senate Amendment (37-0) (Turner)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Senate Amendment (37-0) (Turner)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Safe Playing Fields Act"; restricts use of lawn care pesticides at child care centers, and certain schools, playgrounds, and recreational fields.*
Title
The "Safe Playing Fields Act"; restricts use of lawn care pesticides at child care centers, and certain schools, playgrounds, and recreational fields.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Turner) | |
2011-06-16 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3782 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading