NJ S2615 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes prescription drug donation repository program.
Title
Establishes prescription drug donation repository program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3964 (Same As) 2013-05-06 - Combined with A2188 (ACS)