NJ S2615 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides diamondback terrapins protection as nongame indigenous species.
Title
Provides diamondback terrapins protection as nongame indigenous species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3932 (Same As) 2014-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee