NJ S2615 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S160
Note: Carry Over of previous A674
Note: Carry Over of previous A674
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Motion To Table (21-10) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Motion To Table (21-10) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires firearms seizure when mental health professional determines patient poses threat of harm to self or others.
Title
Requires firearms seizure when mental health professional determines patient poses threat of harm to self or others.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-10) (Weinberg) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Motion To Relieve from Committee (Beck) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-8) (Weinberg) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Motion To Relieve From Committee (Beck) |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2615 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Motion To Table (21-10) (Weinberg)
A2938 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A674 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A2938 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A674 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee