NJ S2633 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4320 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4320 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends ballot receipt and election certification deadlines; increases certain messenger and bearer ballot limits; requires certain information to increase public awareness and use of voting by mail.
Title
Extends ballot receipt and election certification deadlines; increases certain messenger and bearer ballot limits; requires certain information to increase public awareness and use of voting by mail.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4320 (ACS) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4320 (Same As) 2020-08-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.71.