NJ S2638 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5640
Note: Carry Over of previous S4014
Note: Carry Over of previous S4014
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1076 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1076 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG to collect, record, analyze, and report certain prosecutorial and criminal justice data.
Title
Requires AG to collect, record, analyze, and report certain prosecutorial and criminal justice data.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted by A1076 (1R) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1076 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Approved P.L.2020, c.120.
A5640 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4014 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5640 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4014 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee