NJ S2653 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A1428 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Department of Education to develop guidelines for school districts concerning child trafficking awareness and prevention.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Department of Education to develop guidelines for school districts concerning child trafficking awareness and prevention.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A1428 (2R)
2019-03-14SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Ruiz)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1428 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.189.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback