NJ S2654 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S111
Note: Carry Foward to future A1657
Note: Carry Foward to future A1657
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of education, occupation, and credit score as rating factors in automobile insurance underwriting.
Title
Prohibits use of education, occupation, and credit score as rating factors in automobile insurance underwriting.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-13) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2654 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2654 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4179 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2654 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4179 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee