NJ S2660 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.256.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes grant program and tuition reimbursement program for certain teachers of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics; appropriates $5 million to DOE.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes grant program and tuition reimbursement program for certain teachers of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics; appropriates $5 million to DOE.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4098 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.256.
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-3-3)
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted for A4098 (ACS/1R)
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (33-1)
2019-06-20SenateEmergency Resolution (33-1) (Gopal)
2019-06-20SenateSenate Amendment (31-1) (Gopal)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2019-06-10SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4098 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S2660 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback