NJ S2661 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises requirements for swimming pools to comply with certain regulations concerning lifeguards, inspections, and circulation systems.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises requirements for swimming pools to comply with certain regulations concerning lifeguards, inspections, and circulation systems.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted by A4191
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4191 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.23.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback