NJ S2665 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of misleading website to sell event tickets.
Title
Prohibits use of misleading website to sell event tickets.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4081 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.8. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4081 |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4081 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2665