NJ S2674 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises standard for warrantless seizure of animal at risk due to violation of law concerning necessary care and tethering of animals.
Title
Revises standard for warrantless seizure of animal at risk due to violation of law concerning necessary care and tethering of animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4157 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4157 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.83. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4157 (1R) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4157 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S2674 (1R)