NJ S2676 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.106.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires boards of education and nonpublic schools to provide law enforcement authorities with copies of blueprints and maps of schools and school grounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires boards of education and nonpublic schools to provide law enforcement authorities with copies of blueprints and maps of schools and school grounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4112 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.106.
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-1)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A4112
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4112 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2676

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback