NJ S2682 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A542
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A312 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A312 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.
Title
Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A312 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A312 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.227.
A542 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A542 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee