NJ S2682 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New Jersey Rare Disease Advisory Council.
Title
Establishes the New Jersey Rare Disease Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4016 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4016 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.135. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4016 (1R) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4016 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2682 (1R)