NJ S2690 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.257.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers and carriers from engaging in "clawback" and "gag clause" practices; requires certain disclosures by pharmacists; requires Director of Division of Consumer Affairs to conduct public information campaign.***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers and carriers from engaging in "clawback" and "gag clause" practices; requires certain disclosures by pharmacists; requires Director of Division of Consumer Affairs to conduct public information campaign.***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3993 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.257.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3993/2214 (ACS/3R)
2019-05-23AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3993 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2690/2727 (SCS/2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback