NJ S2701 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies sales tax collection responsibilities of horse-boarding businesses in New Jersey; makes change retroactive to October 1, 2006.
Title
Clarifies sales tax collection responsibilities of horse-boarding businesses in New Jersey; makes change retroactive to October 1, 2006.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4241 (Same As) 2016-10-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3126 (Carry Over) 2014-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3126 (Carry Over) 2014-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S2701 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S3000/2701_I1.HTM |