NJ S2708 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain provisions in State contracts for delivery of publicly financed mental health, behavioral health, and addiction services.
Title
Requires certain provisions in State contracts for delivery of publicly financed mental health, behavioral health, and addiction services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4446 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4446 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.1. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Codey) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4446 |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4446 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S2708