NJ S2712 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates certain training for DOE arbitrators.*
Title
Mandates certain training for DOE arbitrators.*
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Ryan Peters [R] | Rep. Joe Howarth [R] | Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4406 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.45. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A4406 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Ruiz) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4406 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2712 (1R)