NJ S2712 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1612

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes minimum direct care staff-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes minimum direct care staff-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4652 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-23AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.112.
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-26-1)
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted for A4652 (1R)
2020-09-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-09-24SenatePassed by the Senate (26-12)
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-09-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4652 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2712 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback