NJ S2714 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to notify State Board of Examiners when teaching staff member fails to report child abuse for determination of revocation or suspension of certificate.
Title
Requires school districts to notify State Board of Examiners when teaching staff member fails to report child abuse for determination of revocation or suspension of certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4408 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.46. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A4408 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4408 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2714