NJ S2714 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2772
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes special occasion events at certain farms on preserved farmland, under certain conditions.
Title
Authorizes special occasion events at certain farms on preserved farmland, under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2714 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5478 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5478 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading