NJ S2722 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4181 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4181 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment of common enrollment system in renaissance school district; expands definition of urban campus area; clarifies that employees of renaissance school projects are in State-administered retirement systems.
Title
Requires establishment of common enrollment system in renaissance school district; expands definition of urban campus area; clarifies that employees of renaissance school projects are in State-administered retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4181 (ACS) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4181 (Same As) 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.129.