NJ S2734 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits DCA to modify required amount for reserve for uncollected taxes in response to COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Permits DCA to modify required amount for reserve for uncollected taxes in response to COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Diegnan) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |