NJ S2740 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2048
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires dealerships to notify buyers of recalls on used motor vehicles for sales; limits attorneys' fees in certain consumer actions.
Title
Requires dealerships to notify buyers of recalls on used motor vehicles for sales; limits attorneys' fees in certain consumer actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-5) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Beach) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2740 (Carry Over) 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A4292 (Same As) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A4292 (Same As) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee