NJ S2747 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4486 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4486 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes MVC to use stored driver's license or identification card photo for longer than eight years; limits certain appointment times at MVC locations to senior citizens and persons with certain medical conditions during COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Authorizes MVC to use stored driver's license or identification card photo for longer than eight years; limits certain appointment times at MVC locations to senior citizens and persons with certain medical conditions during COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4486 (1R) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4486 (Same As) 2020-09-10 - Approved P.L.2020, c.77.