NJ S276 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1457
Note: Carry Foward to future A2846
Note: Carry Over of previous S2442
Note: Carry Foward to future A2846
Note: Carry Over of previous S2442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain local units and authorities, to reduce water, and sewer, and stormwater fees and other charges for low-income persons.**
Title
Permits certain local units and authorities, to reduce water, and sewer, and stormwater fees and other charges for low-income persons.**
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-4) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S276 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S276 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2442 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3864 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S276 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2442 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3864 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading