NJ S2765 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2523
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an apprenticeship requirement to qualify for an electrical contractor's license.
Title
Establishes an apprenticeship requirement to qualify for an electrical contractor's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A2182 |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2182 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.155.
A2523 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-1)
A2523 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-1)