NJ S2765 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.234.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.234.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Civil Services Commission to undertake various initiatives to increase diversity and inclusivity within law enforcement agencies.
Title
Requires Civil Services Commission to undertake various initiatives to increase diversity and inclusivity within law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4542 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4542 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.234. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4542 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4542 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2765 (1R)